DC B21-0481 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Law Number L21-0139 Effective from July 1, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Law Number L21-0139 Effective from July 1, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 21-139 makes changes to the District's Home Purchase Assistance Program. It requires the Mayor to review the repayment structure of the Home Purchase Assistance Program and provide additional repayment options for the lowest income loan recipients. Options to be included are a graduated repayment system and the postponement of repayment on individual loans until after the home is sold. The bill also increases the maximum loan amount to $80,000 from $50,000. The Mayor must submit the revised repayment system to the Council within 60 days after the bill becomes effective.
Title
Home Purchase Assistance Program Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Council | Law Number L21-0139 Effective from July 1, 2016 |
2016-05-20 | Council | Act A21-0393 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 7594 |
2016-05-19 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2016-05-09 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0393 |
2016-05-09 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0393 |
2016-04-25 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 9, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-04-05 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-03-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-03-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0481 |
2016-01-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-12-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-11-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0481 Published in the DC Register |
2015-11-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development |
2015-11-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |