DC B21-0421 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0156 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0156 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 21-156 designates the public alley on Square 2851, bounded by Irving Street NW, Columbia Road NW, 11th Street NW, located in Ward 1, as Theodore Ted Williams Alley.
Title
Theodore "ted" Williams Alley Designation Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-12 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-21 | Council | Law Number L21-0156 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016 |
2016-08-24 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016 |
2016-08-05 | Council | Act A21-0468 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10162 |
2016-07-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0468 |
2016-07-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0468 |
2016-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2016 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-06-28 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-06-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-06-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0421 |
2015-11-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-10-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0421 Published in the DC Register |
2015-10-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2015-10-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |