DC B21-0298 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the District government to pay full-time District employees the difference between their military salaries and their government salary if they are called or ordered into active duty as a member of a reserve unit. Currently, the District is only authorized to issue pay differential for employees called to active duty for Operation Iraqi Freedom in Iraq and Operation Enduring Freedom in Afghanistan.
Title
Active Duty Pay Differential Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0298 |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2015-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-07-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0298 Published in the DC Register |
2015-07-14 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2015-07-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |