DC B21-0279 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, it repeals D.C. Official Code ยง 47-2886.01 through 47-2886.16 to prevent confusion in the licensing and regulation of Professional Engineers in the District of Columbia.
Title
Professional Engineers Licensure And Regulation Clarification Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-12-06 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2016-11-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0279 |
2016-11-15 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0279 |
2016-10-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-07-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0279 Published in the DC Register |
2015-06-30 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs |
2015-06-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |