DC B21-0046 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Act A21-0007, Expires on May 28, 2015 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 2646
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Act A21-0007, Expires on May 28, 2015 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 2646
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New Columbia Statehood Initiative, Omnibus Boards And Commissions, And Election Transition Reform Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2015
Title
New Columbia Statehood Initiative, Omnibus Boards And Commissions, And Election Transition Reform Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Council | Act A21-0007, Expires on May 28, 2015 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 2646 |
2015-02-27 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0007 |
2015-02-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-03 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2015-02-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2015-01-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |