DC B21-0038 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes procedures and safeguards regarding the request for and dispensation of covered medications to qualified patients who are terminally ill and wish to die in a humane and dignified manner. The bill establishes dispensation and reporting requirements for physicians and the Department of Health. The legislation also defines its effect on contracts, wills, insurance and annuity policies and requires that they not be conditioned upon or affected by the making or rescinding of a request for medication or by a patient ingesting covered medication. It establishes terms for immunity from criminal and civil liabilities, establishes penalties and provides an opt-out provision for health care providers. It also provides for claims by the government for costs incurred from a patient terminating his or her life pursuant to the legislation in a public place.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death With Dignity Act Of 2015

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-11-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - Amendment (Alexander) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-06CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
2016-12-23CouncilAct A21-0577 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15697
2016-12-19CouncilSigned with Act Number A21-0577
2016-12-19CouncilEnacted with Act Number A21-0577
2016-12-08CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2016
2016-11-15CouncilAmendment (Alexander)
2016-11-15CouncilFinal Reading
2016-11-01CouncilFirst Reading
2016-11-01CouncilAmendment (Cheh)
2016-10-06CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2016-10-05CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B21-0038
2015-07-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2015-06-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2015-01-30CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B21-0038 Published in the DC Register
2015-01-20CouncilReferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2015-01-14CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback