DC B20-0753 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-05 - Act A20-0489 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12430
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation Network Services Innovation Act Of 2014

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Network Services Innovation Act Of 2014

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #9 (Graham) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #8 (Graham) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #7 (Graham) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #6 (Graham) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #5 (Graham) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #4 (Graham) (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #3 (Graham) - Not considered (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #2 (Graham) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #1 (Graham) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #1 (Cheh) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-05CouncilAct A20-0489 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12430
2014-11-24CouncilReturned from Mayor
2014-11-18CouncilEnacted with Act Number A20-0489
2014-11-13CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 28, 2014
2014-10-28CouncilAmendment #1 (Cheh)
2014-10-07CouncilFirst Reading
2014-10-01CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B20-0753
2014-05-12CouncilPublic Hearing on B20-0753
2014-04-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
2014-04-11CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B20-0753 Published in the District of Columbia Register
2014-04-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2014-04-04CouncilB20-0753 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh and Grosso at Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback