DC B20-0671 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jan 29, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wage Theft Prevention Act Of 2014

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wage Theft Prevention Act Of 2014

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Amendment #2 (Cheh) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Amendment # 1 (Cheh) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Council - First reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-03 - Council - Amendment in Nature of Substitute (Orange) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Council - On agenda - not considered (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-11-21CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jan 29, 2015
2014-10-03CouncilAct A20-0426 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 10157
2014-09-22CouncilReturned from Mayor
2014-09-19CouncilEnacted with Act Number A20-0426
2014-09-08CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Sep 22, 2014
2014-07-14CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2014-06-03CouncilAmendment in Nature of Substitute (Orange)
2014-05-06CouncilOn agenda - not considered
2014-04-29CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2014-04-10CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B20-0671
2014-03-14CouncilPublic Hearing on B20-0671
2014-02-14CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B20-0671 Published in the District of Columbia Register
2014-02-04CouncilB20-0671 Introduced by Councilmembers Orange, Graham, and Cheh at Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback