DC B20-0589 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Act A20-0512 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Act A20-0512 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Severna, Llc, Real Property Tax Exemption And Real Property Tax Relief Amendment Act Of 2013
Title
Severna, Llc, Real Property Tax Exemption And Real Property Tax Relief Amendment Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Tommy Wells [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Council | Act A20-0512 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12727 |
2014-12-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-10 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0512 |
2014-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 12, 2014 |
2014-11-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-10-28 | Council | First Reading |
2014-10-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0589 |
2014-10-16 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0589 |
2014-09-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0589 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-12-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2013-11-27 | Council | B20-0589 Introduced by Councilmember Wells at Office of the Secretary |