DC B20-0377 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Act A20-0129 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 11382, Expires on Oct 24, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Contract No. Gaga-2011-c-0137 Option Year One Contract Modification Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2013

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract No. Gaga-2011-c-0137 Option Year One Contract Modification Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-09CouncilAct A20-0129 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 11382, Expires on Oct 24, 2013
2013-07-30CouncilReturned from Mayor
2013-07-26CouncilEnacted with Act Number A20-0129, Expires on Oct 24, 2013
2013-07-22CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 5, 2013
2013-07-10CouncilRetained by the Council
2013-07-01CouncilB20-0377 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback