DC B20-0301 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Act A20-0087 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 9542, Expires on Sep 17, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Better Prices, Better Quality, Better Choices For Health Coverage Emergency Amendment Act Of 2013

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Better Prices, Better Quality, Better Choices For Health Coverage Emergency Amendment Act Of 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-28CouncilAct A20-0087 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 9542, Expires on Sep 17, 2013
2013-06-21CouncilReturned from Mayor
2013-06-19CouncilEnacted with Act Number A20-0087, Expires on Sep 17, 2013
2013-06-11CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 25, 2013
2013-06-04CouncilRetained by the Council
2013-06-03CouncilB20-0301 Introduced by Councilmember Alexander at Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback