DC B20-0169 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-03 - Public Hearing on B20-0169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-03 - Public Hearing on B20-0169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employee Suggestion Act Of 2013
Title
Employee Suggestion Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-03 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0169 |
2013-09-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-03-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0169 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-03-05 | Council | B20-0169 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B20-0169 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/_layouts/15/uploader/download.aspx?legislationid=29325&filename=B20-0169-INTRODUCTION.pdf |