DC B20-0168 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-21 - Law L20-0063 Effective from Jan 25, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 1429
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cottage Food Act Of 2013

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cottage Food Act Of 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-11-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Council - Amendment (Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-10-01 - Council - 1st Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-21CouncilLaw L20-0063 Effective from Jan 25, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 1429
2013-12-06CouncilAct A20-0219 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 16530
2013-12-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jan 25, 2014
2013-11-27CouncilReturned from Mayor
2013-11-26CouncilEnacted with Act Number A20-0219
2013-11-20CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 5, 2013
2013-11-05CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2013-10-01CouncilAmendment (Alexander)
2013-07-29CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2013-07-12CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B20-0168
2013-07-01CouncilPublic Hearing on B20-0168
2013-06-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
2013-03-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B20-0168 Published in the District of Columbia Register
2013-03-05CouncilB20-0168 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback