DC B20-0153 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Law L20-0096 Effective from Mar 26, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3751
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Law L20-0096 Effective from Mar 26, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3751
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Health Regulation Amendment Act Of 2013
Title
Omnibus Health Regulation Amendment Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | Council | Law L20-0096 Effective from Mar 26, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3751 |
2014-02-14 | Council | Act A20-0273 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 1184 |
2014-02-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 26, 2014 |
2014-02-06 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-02-05 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0273 |
2014-01-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 12, 2014 |
2014-01-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2013-12-03 | Council | First Reading |
2013-11-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2013-10-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0153 |
2013-06-28 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0153 |
2013-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0153 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2013-02-28 | Council | B20-0153 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |