DC B20-0145 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-22 - Law L20-0034 Effective from Nov 5, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 16019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-22 - Law L20-0034 Effective from Nov 5, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 16019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Private Contractor And Subcontractor Prompt Payment Act Of 2013
Title
Private Contractor And Subcontractor Prompt Payment Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] | Cnc. Yvette Alexander [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Muriel Bowser [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Council - 1st Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Council - 1st Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-22 | Council | Law L20-0034 Effective from Nov 5, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 16019 |
2013-09-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Nov 5, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | Council | Act A20-0148 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 11812 |
2013-08-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2013-08-02 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0148 |
2013-07-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 7, 2013 |
2013-07-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2013-06-26 | Council | 1st Reading |
2013-06-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2013-05-31 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0145 |
2013-05-10 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0145 |
2013-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-03-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0145 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-02-19 | Council | B20-0145 Introduced by Councilmember Orange at Committee of the Whole |