CT SR00028 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Memorandum Of Understanding Between The State Of Connecticut, Office Of Labor Relations And The Connecticut State Employees Association, Education Professions (p-3b) Concerning Accretion Of Employees In The Classifications Of State School Principal 1 And State School Principal 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Memorandum Of Understanding Between The State Of Connecticut, Office Of Labor Relations And The Connecticut State Employees Association, Education Professions (p-3b) Concerning Accretion Of Employees In The Classifications Of State School Principal 1 And State School Principal 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-23SenateAdopted, Senate
2023-05-12SenateFile Number 768
2023-05-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 509
2023-05-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-05-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-09SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/23 5:00 PM
2023-05-08SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-08SenateSenate Favorable
2023-05-02SenatePublic Hearing 05/08
2023-04-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
2023-04-25SenateFiled with Senate Clerks

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback