CT SR00026 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Tentative Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The Administrative And Residual (p-5) Bargaining Unit.
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Tentative Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The Administrative And Residual (p-5) Bargaining Unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 42 ADOPT (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | File Number 665 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 323 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |