CT SR00016 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - File Number 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Approving The Stipulated Agreement In Dallas Church, By His Next Friend And Father, Jerry Barrios V. State Of Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Approving The Stipulated Agreement In Dallas Church, By His Next Friend And Father, Jerry Barrios V. State Of Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateFile Number 5
2023-03-01SenateSenate Calendar Number 41
2023-03-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-03-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-02-23SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/23 5:00 PM
2023-02-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-02-22SenateSenate Favorable
2023-02-03SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2023-02-01SenateFiled with Senate Clerks

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback