CT SR00015 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Rollin Cook Of Weatogue To Be Commissioner Of Correction.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Rollin Cook Of Weatogue To Be Commissioner Of Correction.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 24 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 12 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |