CT SR00013 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of An Agreement Between The University Of Connecticut Board Of Trustees And The Graduate Employee Union Local 6950- International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace And Agricultural Implement Workers Of America (geu-uaw).
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of An Agreement Between The University Of Connecticut Board Of Trustees And The Graduate Employee Union Local 6950- International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace And Agricultural Implement Workers Of America (geu-uaw).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | File Number 537 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 393 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/18 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |