CT SR00011 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Superseding Settlement Agreement In Robert Barfield, Et Al. V. Angel Quiros, In His Official Capacity As Commissioner, Connecticut Department Of Correction.
Title
Resolution Approving The Superseding Settlement Agreement In Robert Barfield, Et Al. V. Angel Quiros, In His Official Capacity As Commissioner, Connecticut Department Of Correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | File Number 626 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 454 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |