CT SR00010 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Settlement Of William H. Shehadi, Jr., A Conserved Person, By And Through The Conservator Of His Estate, Albert B. Shehadi V. The State Of Connecticut, Et Al.
Title
Resolution Approving The Settlement Of William H. Shehadi, Jr., A Conserved Person, By And Through The Conservator Of His Estate, Albert B. Shehadi V. The State Of Connecticut, Et Al.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | File Number 625 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 453 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |