CT SR00008 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Unfavorable Report, Accepted by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Unfavorable Report, Accepted by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Settlement Agreement In Juan F., Et Al. V. Dannel Malloy, Et Al.
Title
Resolution Approving The Settlement Agreement In Juan F., Et Al. V. Dannel Malloy, Et Al.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 27 ADOPT (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-23 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Unfavorable Report, Accepted by Senate |
2017-01-25 | Senate | File Number 2 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 27 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Unfavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office - Unfavorable |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Motion Failed SF |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/23 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |