CT SR00005 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Senate Recommitted to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Senate Recommitted to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Settlement Agreement In Robert Barfield, Et Al. V. Angel Quiros, In His Official Capacity As Commissioner, Connecticut Department Of Correction.
Title
Resolution Approving The Settlement Agreement In Robert Barfield, Et Al. V. Angel Quiros, In His Official Capacity As Commissioner, Connecticut Department Of Correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Judiciary |
2021-01-29 | Senate | File Number 1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 15 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/01/21 5:00 PM |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/20 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |