CT SR00004 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - File Number 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - File Number 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Settlement Agreement In Sheff V. O'neill.
Title
Resolution Approving The Settlement Agreement In Sheff V. O'neill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | File Number 4 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 27 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |