CT SR00004 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Thomas E. Kruger Of Cos Cob To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Board Of Trustees For The University Of Connecticut.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Thomas E. Kruger Of Cos Cob To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Board Of Trustees For The University Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 32 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 1 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |