CT SJ00164 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Accepting The Recommendation Of The Claims Commissioner To Grant An Award To Luis Ortiz On His Claim Against The State.
Title
Resolution Accepting The Recommendation Of The Claims Commissioner To Grant An Award To Luis Ortiz On His Claim Against The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 158 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-06 | House | Adopted, House |
2024-05-02 | House | House Calendar Number 448 |
2024-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | File Number 474 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 286 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |