CT SJ00041 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Michael J. Ajello Of North Haven To Be Reappointed A Member Of The State Elections Enforcement Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Michael J. Ajello Of North Haven To Be Reappointed A Member Of The State Elections Enforcement Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 231 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateAdopted, House
2019-05-30SenateHouse Calendar Number 671
2019-05-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-28SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-28SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-05-22SenateSenate Calendar Number 588
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-21SenatePublic Hearing 05/21
2019-05-06SenateNomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback