CT SJ00040 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Melissa Kane Of Westport To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Melissa Kane Of Westport To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateIn Concurrence
2019-05-23SenateAdopted, House
2019-05-23SenateRules Suspended
2019-05-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 640
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-21SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-21SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-05-16SenateSenate Calendar Number 519
2019-05-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16SenatePublic Hearing 05/16
2019-04-24SenateNomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback