CT SJ00039 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - File Number 312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - File Number 312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Approving An Amendment To The State Constitution To Protect Real Property Held Or Controlled By The State.
Title
Resolution Approving An Amendment To The State Constitution To Protect Real Property Held Or Controlled By The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | File Number 312 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 164 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |