CT SJ00038 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Laura F. Baldini Of West Hartford To Be An Alternate Member Of The Judicial Review Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Laura F. Baldini Of West Hartford To Be An Alternate Member Of The Judicial Review Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 180 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 638 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 517 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 05/16 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |