CT SJ00033 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of James Gildea Of Derby To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of James Gildea Of Derby To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 45 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-04-18 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 287 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-11 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 35 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |