CT SJ00030 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Reginald D. Betts Of New Haven To Be A Member Of The Criminal Justice Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Reginald D. Betts Of New Haven To Be A Member Of The Criminal Justice Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 91 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateIn Concurrence
2019-05-14SenateAdopted, House
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 537
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-05-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 458
2019-05-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-30SenatePublic Hearing 04/30
2019-03-29SenateNomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback