CT SJ00027 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing A State Constitutional Amendment Allowing For No-excuse Absentee Voting.
Title
Resolution Proposing A State Constitutional Amendment Allowing For No-excuse Absentee Voting.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | File Number 459 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 210 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |