CT SJ00027 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable David M. Sheridan Of Manchester To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable David M. Sheridan Of Manchester To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. John Kissel [R] | Rep. William Tong [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 133 (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 29 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 29 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-04-30 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 281 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-11 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 30 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |