CT SJ00026 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of David Jimenez Of Hartford To Be A Member Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of David Jimenez Of Hartford To Be A Member Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 21 ADOPT (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateIn Concurrence
2019-03-27SenateAdopted, House
2019-03-14SenateHouse Calendar Number 51
2019-03-14SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-13SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-03-06SenateSenate Calendar Number 35
2019-03-06SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-05SenatePublic Hearing 03/0519
2019-02-25SenateNomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback