CT SJ00024 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Lubbie Harper, Jr. Of North Haven To Be A State Referee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Lubbie Harper, Jr. Of North Haven To Be A State Referee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 20 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 14 (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseIn Concurrence
2019-03-13HouseAdopted, House
2019-03-13HouseRules Suspended
2019-03-13HouseRules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
2019-03-13SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-02-27SenateSenate Calendar Number 26
2019-02-27SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-02-25SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-14SenateNomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback