CT SJ00019 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Attorney Genea Odessa Bell Of Colchester To Be A Member Of The Judicial Review Council As An Alternate Attorney-at-law.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Attorney Genea Odessa Bell Of Colchester To Be A Member Of The Judicial Review Council As An Alternate Attorney-at-law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 32 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 28 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 32 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |