CT SJ00014 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - File Number 663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To propose an amendment to the Constitution of the state to permit early in-person voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Proposing A State Constitutional Amendment To Permit Early Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateFile Number 663
2019-04-15SenateSenate Calendar Number 322
2019-04-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-06SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback