CT SJ00012 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - House Calendar Number 442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - House Calendar Number 442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Recognizing And Honoring Veterans Of The Vietnam War Who Were Exposed To Agent Orange.
Title
Resolution Recognizing And Honoring Veterans Of The Vietnam War Who Were Exposed To Agent Orange.
Sponsors
House Veterans' and Military Affairs Committee | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Sen. Jeff Gordon [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 81 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | House Calendar Number 442 |
2023-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-27 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2023-03-07 | Senate | File Number 30 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 52 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/23 5:00 PM |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' and Military Affairs |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' and Military Affairs |