CT SJ00005 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Pamela K. Elkow Of Redding To Be Reappointed To The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Port Authority.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Pamela K. Elkow Of Redding To Be Reappointed To The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Port Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 35 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-04-18 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 292 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-11 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 4 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |