CT SJ00003 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Memorializing Congress To Recognize Women In The Cadet Nurse Corps During World War Ii As Veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Memorializing Congress To Recognize Women In The Cadet Nurse Corps During World War Ii As Veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 112 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateAdopted, House
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 558
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 238
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 132
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
2019-02-26SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-24SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback