CT SB01229 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - File Number 573
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) include the reasons for calls for emergency medical services in the emergency medical services data collection system, (2) require the Commissioner of Public Health to report to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health regarding data collected by such data collection system, (3) require that the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board include a member from the Connecticut Association of Paramedics and EMTs, and (4) require such advisory board to (A) study the shortage of emergency medical services personnel, and (B) annually report to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health concerning emergency medical services in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Emergency Medical Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13SenateFile Number 573
2023-04-13SenateSenate Calendar Number 345
2023-04-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-04-13SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-06SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-27SenateJoint Favorable
2023-03-17SenatePublic Hearing 03/22
2023-03-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback