CT SB01226 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - House Calendar Number 613
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - House Calendar Number 613
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To afford mechanisms for the challenge of certain election administration laws, practices or procedures that may impair the electoral rights of certain protected classes of individuals.
Title
An Act Concerning State Voting Rights In Recognition Of John R. Lewis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 266 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 267 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 268 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 269 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 267 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 268 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 269 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | House Calendar Number 613 |
2023-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-25 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8756 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8753 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8747 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8791 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-17 | Senate | File Number 610 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 364 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |