CT SB01221 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-02 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-02 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Implementation Of The Approved Settlement Agreement In The Connecticut Hospital Association Et Al. V. Connecticut Department Of Social Services Et Al. And Making Appropriations Therefor.
Title
An Act Concerning Implementation Of The Approved Settlement Agreement In The Connecticut Hospital Association Et Al. V. Connecticut Department Of Social Services Et Al. And Making Appropriations Therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] | Rep. Themis Klarides [R] |
Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 319 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 447 PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 396 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 447 PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 396 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-02 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-12-20 | House | Public Act 19-1 |
2019-12-19 | House | Signed by Governor in Original |
2019-12-18 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-12-18 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-12-18 | House | House Passed |
2019-12-18 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the House |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Emergency Certification |