CT SB01201 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning Responsible And Equitable Regulation Of Adult-use Cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Responsible And Equitable Regulation Of Adult-use Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 479 (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 408 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION SENATE AMD A (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 409 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD A (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 410 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD B (Y: 52 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 411 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD C (Y: 53 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 412 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD D (Y: 21 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 413 AS AMENDED (Y: 76 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 476 (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 475 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-30SenatePublic Act 21-1
2021-06-22SenateSigned by Governor in Original
2021-06-17SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Governor
2021-06-17SenateIn Concurrence
2021-06-17SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-17SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-17SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10928
2021-06-17SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 10906
2021-06-17SenateSenate Reconsidered
2021-06-16SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2021-06-16HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-16HouseAmendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule E 10988
2021-06-16HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 10935
2021-06-16HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10936
2021-06-16HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 10981
2021-06-16HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10984
2021-06-16HouseHouse Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B
2021-06-16HouseHouse Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-15HouseImmediate Transmittal to the House
2021-06-15SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
2021-06-15SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10928
2021-06-15SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10906
2021-06-14SenateEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB01201&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-01201-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00001-R00SB-01201SS1-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00SA-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00HA-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00SB-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10986-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10981-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10935-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10953-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10936-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00HE-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-01201-R00-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10906-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-01201-R00SS1-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-01201-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10928-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10936-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10953-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10935-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10984-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10981-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10986-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-01201-R01SS1-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01201-R00LCO10988-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-01201-R02SS1-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-01201-R02-FN.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00475-R00SB01201-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00476-R00SB01201-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00413-R00SB01201-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00412-R00SB01201-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00411-R00SB01201-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00410-R00SB01201-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00409-R00SB01201-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00408-R00SB01201-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00479-R00SB01201-SV.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback