CT SB01177 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - File Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - File Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To eliminate the subminimum wage in the state and create one minimum fair wage.
Title
An Act Concerning One Fair Wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | File Number 448 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 261 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |