CT SB01166 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - File Number 446
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the Connecticut school climate policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Implementation Of The Connecticut School Climate Policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-17 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-05SenateFile Number 446
2023-04-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 259
2023-04-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-04-05SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-30SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-17SenateJoint Favorable
2023-03-03SenatePublic Hearing 03/08
2023-03-02SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback