CT SB01165 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require financial literacy instruction in high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Financial Literacy Instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 191 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2023-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2023-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2023-06-05SenatePublic Act 23-21
2023-05-30SenateIn Concurrence
2023-05-30HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2023-05-30HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2023-05-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 513
2023-05-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-05-09HouseSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2023-05-09SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2023-05-09SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7328
2023-05-09SenateRules Suspended
2023-05-09SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-05-09SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-09SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-08SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-08SenateJoint Favorable
2023-05-04SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-28SenateFile Number 257
2023-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 182
2023-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-21SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-10SenateJoint Favorable
2023-03-03SenatePublic Hearing 03/08
2023-03-02SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB01165&which_year=2023
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-01165-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-01165-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-01165-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/ACT/PA/PDF/2023PA-00021-R00SB-01165-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/amd/S/pdf/2023SB-01165-R00SA-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023SB-01165-R000257-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023SB-01165-R000257-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023SB-01165-R00LCO07328-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023SB-01165-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023SB-01165-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/SUM/PDF/2023SUM00021-R02SB-01165-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/S/PDF/2023SB-01165-R00ED-CV9-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/S/PDF/2023SB-01165-R00APP-CV150-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/S/PDF/2023SV-00148-R00SB01165-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/H/PDF/2023HV-00191-R00SB01165-HV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback