CT SB01153 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-19 - House Calendar Number 560
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-19 - House Calendar Number 560
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Freedom of Information Act to exempt certain proprietary records held by a public institution of higher education pertaining to research or teaching from disclosure.
Title
An Act Establishing An Exemption From Disclosure For Certain Higher Education Records Pertaining To Study, Teaching Or Research Under The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 192 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | House Calendar Number 560 |
2023-05-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7895 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | File Number 519 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 315 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |